HI HB1109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes procedures and eligibility criteria for a privilege to practice public accountancy in this State for public accountants and certified public accountants licensed in another state with comparable education, examination, and experience requirements. Subjects all holders of a privilege to practice to the regulatory and enforcement jurisdiction of the Board of Accountancy. (HB1109 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Accountancy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 101).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Hashimoto, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Onishi, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-14HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 22
2019-02-08HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Hashimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:31AM in conference room 430.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19 at 11:31 AM.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB208 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback