HI HB1109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1109
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies who may be granted a temporary permit to practice public accountancy. Specifies the requirements that must be met prior to obtaining a temporary permit to practice. Requires a person to obtain a temporary permit to practice from the board of public accountancy prior to commencing public accountancy services in Hawaii. Specifies a time frame for the temporary permit to practice. Requires persons granted a temporary permit to practice to consent to and certify various obligations, including being under the authority of the board of public accountancy and paying all applicable taxes to the State. Makes conforming amendments to the laws relating to public accountancy. Takes effect on 1/1/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Accountancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Hashimoto, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Onishi, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Re-referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Hashimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:31AM in conference room 430. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19 at 11:31 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB208 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.