HI HB1116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends ballot requirements to display candidates for the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs by residency and non-residency requirements. Requires the names of the candidates in each group to be randomized on individual ballots and on ballots across precincts by the feasible method that provides the greatest degree of randomization. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:30PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; English, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ihara, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Holt added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-15HouseRe-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 826) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-19SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:19PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 443).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-19.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB729 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback