HI HB1116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends ballot requirements to display candidates for the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs by residency and non-residency requirements. Requires the names of the candidates in each group to be randomized on individual ballots and on ballots across precincts by the feasible method that provides the greatest degree of randomization. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; English, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Holt added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 826) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:19PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 443). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-19. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB729 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1116 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 325.
HB1116 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 325.