HI HB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a tax clearance before a professional or vocational license may be issued or renewed. Applies to taxable years after 12/31/2020.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB112 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=112&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB112_.HTM |