HI HB1125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for Fiscal Biennium 2019-21 for operations of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs division under Program ID CCA104 - Financial Services Regulation. House Committee on Intrastate Commerce. Repeals the existing statutory requirement that $2,000,000 of certain taxes collected on bank and financial corporations be deposited to the credit of the compliance resolution fund. Requires adjustments to fees and assessments collected by the Division of Financial Institutions based on the amount of moneys credited to the division in the compliance resolution fund. Requires the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to adjust fees or cease collection of payments when the mortgage loan recovery fund attains a funding level of $750,000. (HB1125 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 445).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in conference room 430.
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 11:30am.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:45AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback