HI HB1130 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 278, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1384).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes the five regional chief executive officers on the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation (HHSC) Board, ex-officio, nonvoting members. Adds five regional system board members appointed by the governor to serve as voting members on the HHSC Board. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Board; Composition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 278, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1384).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 278, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1384).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-04-22HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-04-23SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 716).
2013-04-22HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1).
2013-04-22HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-04-22SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 715).
2013-04-22SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 713).
2013-04-19HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13.
2013-04-19HouseHouse conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Belatti, Luke (Co-)Chairman; Morikawa, Fukumoto.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto.
2013-04-15HouseRe-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 53
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1345) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2013-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to HTH, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 326).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ito voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-28HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-06HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback