HI HB1138 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 223, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 223, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a lien on an attorney's firm for unpaid certified shorthand reporter services requested by the attorney. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1138 CD1)
Title
Attorney's Lien; Certified Shorthand Reporter Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 223, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 223, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 78). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 78) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Luke, B. Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 8:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Luke, B. Oshiro, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 558) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1203) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 275). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Morita excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-11 2:30PM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |