HI HB114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Act 087, on 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Act 087, on 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Administrator of the State Procurement Office, rather than the University of Hawaii President, to serve as the chief procurement officer for specified procurement for construction. Requires procurement for professional services for construction projects to be coordinated with the Department of Accounting and General Services. Establishes an Independent Audit Committee within the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB114 CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Procurement; Independent Audit Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Act 087, on 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187). |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Act 87, 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Dela Cruz, Ige, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Luke, Nakashima, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Dela Cruz, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Choy, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Fale. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 474) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1390) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-13 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 175). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Fale. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-07-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2013-02-01 | House | Recommitted to HED as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) McKelvey, Ohno, Woodson excused. |
2013-02-01 | House | Recommends recommittal to HED. |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19) as amended in HD 1. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HED, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |