HI HB1146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1146
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires procurement officers to complete past performance evaluations of contractors. Requires past performance to be considered in all sole source procurement and any competitive contracts that exceeds the small purchase threshold. Establishes an initial procurement working group that will evaluate and make recommendations to the legislature about the effectiveness of existing procurement methods. Requires the development and implementation of a statewide past performance database. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 828) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2063) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 4:00PM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 687) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1146 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:00PM in conference room 325.