HI HB115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the campus planning facility board, major repairs and replacement special fund, and major repairs and replacement fee to address University repairs and maintenance. Transfers special fund moneys to the new special fund in fiscal years 2015-2016 and 2016-2017. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
University of Hawaii; Repair and Maintenance; Bonds ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 4:15PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Choy, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Fale. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 475) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-13 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 176). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 770) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-06 | House | Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2013-02-06 | House | Recommitted to HED as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Say, Souki excused. |
2013-02-06 | House | Recommends recommittal to HED. |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 163) as amended in HD 1. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committee recommends that the short form bill pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HED, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |