HI HB115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county with a population of over five hundred thousand or greater to take ownership and jurisdiction over all disputed roads under certain circumstances. Defines disputed roads. (HB115 CD1)
Title
Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 17; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara. Noes, 8 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kim, Riviere, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 195). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 195) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Luke, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:15AM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Galuteria, L. Thielen Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green, Kim, Riviere . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1500) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM, with Senator Harimoto voting "No". |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 26). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |