HI HB1154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owner-builders to provide proof of withholding taxes and workers' compensation insurance. Amends fines for failure to comply with statute. (HB1154 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Owner-builder Exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, D. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Ward, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to IAC, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1154 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.