HI HB1156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1156
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the broadband service infrastructure grant program to award grants to applicants to extend deployment of facilities used to provide broadband service to unserved and underserved areas of the State. Makes an appropriation. (HB1156 HD1)
Title
Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Nishimoto, McDermott. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Quinlan. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/IAC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
SB553 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB553 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).