HI HB1170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and funds a three-year pilot project to demonstrate new toilet and sewage treatment technologies and to expedite demonstration projects. Repeals on 6/30/2022. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1252) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1170 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.