HI HB1172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals requirement that there be attached a clear and legible notice, placard, or marker upon the faucet, spigot, or outlet wherefrom the draught beer is drawn. Requires rules adopted by the counties related to stacking of beer to refer to a standard serving of total volume that shall not exceed thirty-two ounces of total volume before a customer at any one time. (HB1172 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Liquor Laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 264).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 11
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB772 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 226, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback