HI HB1180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Act 009, 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Act 009, 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for disaster relief, recovery, mitigation, and remediation activities for the County of Hawaii. Requires reporting of monthly expenditures to the Department of Budget and Finance. (HB1180 HD1)
Title
Relating To Natural Disasters.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Act 009, 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2019-04-16 | House | Act 009, on 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2019-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 541). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Kim). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-19. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1651) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura excused (1). |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from PVM/WLH/HSG/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Ward. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/WLH/HSG/HSH on Friday, 02-08-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM/WLH/HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.