HI HB1187 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 246, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 246, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates January as Human Trafficking Awareness Month. Specifically includes minor victims of sex and labor trafficking within the scope of the Child Protective Act and laws relating to the State's child abuse law. (HB1187 CD1)
Title
Human Trafficking Awareness Month; Services; Minor Victims of Prostitution and Labor Trafficking
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 246, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 246, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 70). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 70) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Rhoads, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 600) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 9 offered. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HMS/TEC. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Re-referred to HUS, referral sheet 29 |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |