HI HB1187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the primary election in 2018, requires the office of elections to implement election by mail in a county with a population of fewer than 100,000 and beginning with the 2020 primary election, implement election by mail in each of the other counties for all elections. Establishes an election by mail system, including requirements for ballots, replacement ballots, deficient return of ballots, electronic transmission of replacement ballots under certain circumstances, ballot counting, voter service centers, places of deposit, and election expenses and responsibilities. Establishes procedures for postponed elections. Makes conforming amendments to provide for an election by mail system. Allows voters in an election by mail system to request that their ballots be temporarily forwarded to another address in or outside of the State for a single election or a primary or special primary election and the election immediately following it. Appropriates funds for the implementation and administration of the elections by mail program. Requires the office of elections to submit annual reports to the legislature from 2018 to 2024 regarding implementing the elections by mail program.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
HB1187 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1187 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Election Expenses
Election Results
Elections
Elections by Mail
Postposed Elections
Voting
Election Expenses
Election Results
Elections
Elections by Mail
Postposed Elections
Voting
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1187&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1187_.HTM |