HI HB1195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Federal Furlough Loan Program to provide loans to eligible federal workers affected by the federal shutdown furlough. Provides an emergency appropriation to carry out the purposes of the loan program. (HB1195 HD1)
Title
Relating To Federal Workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1384) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1119), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB1454 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
SB1454 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.