HI HB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1200
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "employer" in chapter 388, HRS, to include the State and counties when a provision in that chapter has no comparable provision in chapter 78, HRS.
Title
Relating To Employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1200 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB133 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/PSM.
SB133 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/PSM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1200&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1200_.HTM |