HI HB1202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 182, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 182, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a professional or vocational licensee who inadvertently fails to maintain licensing requirements but who subsequently corrects the failure so that there was no lapse in licensure shall not be guilty of unlicensed activity. Clarifies that a contractor who inadvertently fails to maintain licensing requirements and who subsequently corrects the failure so that there was a lapse of no more than sixty days in licensure shall not be guilty of unlicensed contracting activity. (SD1)
Title
Licensees; Contractors; Unlicensed Contracting Offenses; Unlicensed Activity
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 182, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 182, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2013-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 714). |
2013-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Fukumoto, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-19 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 710). |
2013-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 567) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1373) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-03-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-02-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:50AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1000) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-19-13 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla voting no (1) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |