HI HB1207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 240, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 240, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to submit to Legislature interim reports on program integrity prior to 2015 and 2016 Regular Sessions and a final report prior to 2017 Regular Session on its compliance with the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010 as it relates to Medicaid. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB1207 CD1)
Title
Department of Human Services Compliance; Affordable Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 240, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 240, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Deferred until 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Deferred one day 04-30-13. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-13. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14). |
2013-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-13. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Green, Taniguchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll Chair; Jordan, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS will hold a public decision making on 04-02-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2013-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 68). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami excused (5). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |