HI HB121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 021, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 021, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the Captain Cook memorial fund, custodial services special fund, donations for voter registration drive trust account, and information technology trust fund of the Department of Accounting and General Services and transfers unencumbered balances to the general fund.
Title
Related To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Act 021, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122). |
2019-04-24 | House | Act 021, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 580). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1734) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3). |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=121&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB121_.HTM |