HI HB1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds unlicensed sale of liquor as an offense for which property is subject to forfeiture and increases the grade of the offense to a class C felony. Provides an affirmative defense. Amends definitions of "organized crime" and "racketeering activity" to include the unlicensed sale of liquor.
Title
Relating To Liquor.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1210 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6
SB638 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
SB638 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1210&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1210_.HTM |