HI HB1212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 655).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 655).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that there is no significant privacy interest for the record of complaints including all dispositions compiled as part of an inquiry into an individual's fitness to be granted or to retain a license, but in the case of persons licensed under title 25, the provision only applies to the record of complaints resolved against that person. Effective upon its approval. Sunsets July 1, 2013. (HB1212 CD1)
Title
Public Documents; Privacy
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 655). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 417). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Belatti, Berg, Hanohano, Luke, Marumoto, Morita, Takumi voting no (7) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 18 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Hooser, Slom . 7 No(es): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Fukunaga, Gabbard, Green, Ige, Ihara. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 40-10). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 40-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Choy, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-20-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-15-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu Chair; Choy, Mizuno, Thielen. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Takamine, Slom. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 567). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Bunda, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Ige, Kidani . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Espero, Ihara). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 673) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, Wakai, Thielen. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-09 2:05pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |