HI HB1215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who live within 10 miles of their place of employment to offset expenses incurred for motor vehicle registration and inspection.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1215 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1215&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1215_.HTM |