HI HB1219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 5:55PM in Conference Room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 5:55PM in Conference Room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the designation of areas or regions of public lands classified as commercial, industrial, resort and hotel, and the establishment and implementation of guidelines for the redevelopment of the areas or regions that will: (1) modernize the policies for the management of public lands in the designated area; (2) establish a plan for the designated area, including district-wide improvements, that is coordinated with state and county land use and planning policies; and (3) implement asset and property management concepts that can optimize income from the properties and evolve in response to changing principles of property administration. Designates the public lands on the Waiakea peninsula on the island of Hawaii as the Waiakea Peninsula Redevelopment District. Allows DLNR to issue a rent reduction or waiver for certain lessee's expenses for demolition or provision of basic infrastructure. Authorizes a local redevelopment agency to contract with a developer for construction of non-residential projects on public land within a redevelopment area. Exempts the costs of construction of work or improvements of a redevelopment project from general excise and use taxes. Takes effect provided that the County of Hawaii repeals the Banyan Drive Hawaii redevelopment agency. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 5:55PM in Conference Room 312. |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 5:45PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 848). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Onishi, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 838) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2035) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1219 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 5:55PM in Conference Room 312.