HI HB122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to enable it to contract with eligible non-profit or charitable organizations, private entities, or public entities to trap, neuter or spay, and release feral cats to the location where they were originally trapped.
Title
Relating To Feral Cats.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB122 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=122&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB122_.HTM |