HI HB122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 018, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 018, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the Juvenile Accountability Block Grant Trust Fund of the Department of Defense and transfers the unencumbered balance to the general fund.
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Act 018, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2019-04-24 | House | Act 018, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 648). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1770) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 15). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=122&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB122_.HTM |