HI HB1229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide education and support to local businesses regarding the Food and Drug Administration's industry guidance on colored sea salt; provided that Hawaii sea salt industry companies will collectively pay for half of the cost to conduct a study regarding the Food and Drug Administration's approval of color additives used in Hawaii sea salt. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 12:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 12:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 839) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Moriwaki, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1927) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 272). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
SB1497 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB1497 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.