HI HB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by a University of Hawaii community college or a four-year campus to expand opportunities for international college experiences for University of Hawaii students. Requires the University of Hawaii to work in collaboration with the department of business, economic development, and tourism and requires a report to be submitted to the legislature.
Title
Relating To International Education Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1231 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB200 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB200 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1231&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1231_.HTM |