HI HB1234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an application for motor vehicle registration to include additional identifying information. Authorizes the counties to assess a fine against the legal or registered owner of a vehicle deemed abandoned. Requires the legal or registered owner to have up-to-date motor vehicle registration and motor vehicle insurance prior to repossession of the abandoned vehicle. Requires DOT to implement records database linking driver's license, motor vehicle registration, traffic citation divisions, and motor vehicle control. (HB1234 HD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 617), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1234 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB1297 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
SB1297 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.