HI HB124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers administration of the Public Utilities Commission special fund to the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. (HB124 HD1)
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB124 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.