HI HB1253 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the membership of the state capitol management committee by including the lieutenant governor and the lieutenant governor's chief of staff. Prohibits the lieutenant governor from being represented on the committee by a designee.
Title
Relating To The State Capitol Management Committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1253 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6
SB647 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB647 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1253&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1253_.HTM |