HI HB1259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 040, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates capital improvement projects for fiscal biennium 20192021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Capital Improvement Projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 040, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
2019-06-12HouseAct 040, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 155).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 155) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Cullen, Luke, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 811).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Cullen, Luke, McDermott.
2019-03-19SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503).
2019-03-18HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-03-15HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 532) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-15SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-13Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-15-19.
2019-03-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-13SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-01SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 135).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-20HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3).
2019-02-20HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback