HI HB1262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the governing body of a county to create, by ordinance, a process for the recordation and enforcement of solar easements. Allows counties to require individuals claiming a solar right to record that right by filing a declaration with the county clerk. Permits the governing body of a county to require, by ordinance, the trimming of vegetation that blocks solar radiation from solar energy devices. Authorizes the ordinance to include a designation for the cost of trimming.
Title
Relating To Solar Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1262 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB834 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
SB834 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1262&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1262_.HTM |