HI HB1268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 111, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 111, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes And The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, And Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 111, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 111, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 877). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-25-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 866). |
2019-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 898). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 507). |
2019-03-25 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 534) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-22-19. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 275). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say, Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB618 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.