HI HB1270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BLNR to enter into negotiations to acquire the property identified as Tax Map Key: (3) 6-8-001:030 Kamuela, Hawaii. Appropriation. (HB1270 HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Acquisition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 176). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 602) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1270 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL, WAM.