HI HB1272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 183, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes pharmacies to accept the return of any prescription drug for disposal via collection receptacles or mail-back programs; prohibits pharmacies from redispensing returned prescription drugs or accepting returned prescription drugs in exchange for cash or credit; requires the pharmacist-in-charge to ensure that only authorized reverse distributors acquire prescription drugs collected via collection receptacles or mail-back programs. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prescription Drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 183, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
2019-07-05HouseAct 183, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
2019-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871).
2019-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2).
2019-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 861).
2019-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19.
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 682) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 425) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB808 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback