HI HB1273 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 228, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 228, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes hydroelectric facilities that generate up to 500 kilowatts of electricity as a permissible use on agricultural lands if the hydroelectric facilities are accessory to agricultural activities for agricultural use only and if certain other conditions are met. (HB1273 CD1)
Title
Agricultural Land; Permissible Use; Hydroelectric Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 228, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 228, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15 |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Baker, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, C. Lee, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Gabbard, Baker Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, C. Lee, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Woodson, Ward. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 436). |
2015-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 487) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1339) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from AGL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AGL/ENE, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-15. |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-17-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-04 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |