HI HB1277 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1277
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students at any four-year University of Hawaii campus who meet certain eligibility criteria. Makes an appropriation for the Hawaii Promise Program. (HB1277 HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 114). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1277 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
Four-Year University of Hawaii Campus ($)
Scholarships
University of Hawaii Promise Program
Four-Year University of Hawaii Campus ($)
Scholarships
University of Hawaii Promise Program