HI HB1279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 153, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 153, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $250,000 and authorizes the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to receive monetary donations and to expend moneys for programs related to the reintegration of offenders into the general population. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB1279 CD1)
Title
Reintegration of Offenders; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 153, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 153, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 104). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 104) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:00pm in Conference Room 312. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 10:15AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:20AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 10:20AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Aquino, Ing Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, McDermott. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 575) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 128). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB204 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 30