HI HB131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes hemp to the extent legalized under federal law. Requires the Chairperson of the Board of Agriculture to prepare and submit a proposed state plan to monitor and regulate hemp production, including commercial production and research, to the federal Secretary of Agriculture pursuant to section 297B of the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946, as amended. Authorizes the Department of Agriculture to monitor and regulate hemp production. Allows Industrial Hemp Pilot Project licensee to utilize hemp genetics. Requires reports to the Governor and Legislature. Effective 9/22/2050. (HB131 HD2)
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB131 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
SB1335 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
SB1335 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.