HI HB1310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LMG/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LMG/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DAGS and DPS, in consultation with the Legislature and other entities, to plan and implement security improvements at the State Capitol. Requires DAGS to remove all parking meters from the Capitol parking facility and reallocate parking in the Capitol district. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on LMG/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1310 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LMG/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1310&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1310_.HTM |