HI HB1312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 189, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to be appropriated into and out of the rental housing revolving fund. (HB1312 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 189, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
2019-07-05HouseAct 189, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 145).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 145) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Riviere, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:31PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Matayoshi, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 848) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2007) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 117).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:15AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB636 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback