HI HB1315 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to article IX, section 5, of the Constitution of the State of Hawaii, to require the State to assure that each resident of the State has access to housing, subject to standards and criteria to be provided by the Legislature. (HB1315 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing Amendments To Article Ix, Section 5, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
2019-02-04HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Woodson.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB635 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback