HI HB1316 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of an electronic voting device in condominium association meetings. Requires a condominium board to take reasonable steps to ensure secrecy and integrity of the votes, and that an audit trail be available after the meeting.
Title
Relating To Condominium Voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1316 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1288 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 014, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
SB1288 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 014, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1316&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1316_.HTM |