HI HB1319 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 041, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes special purpose revenue bonds for Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc. and its subsidiaries Maui Electric Company and Hawaii Electric Light Company for multi-project capital improvement programs. (HB1319 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds For Electric Public Utilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 041, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
2019-06-12HouseAct 041, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 96).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 96) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:40PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 683) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1767) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 462).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:45AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback