HI HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - The committee(s) on JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the class B felony offense of prohibited acts related to female genital mutilation. Includes commission of prohibited acts related to female genital mutilation in the statutory definition of child abuse or neglect and as a prohibited act under the State's Child Protective Act. (HB132 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Female Genital Mutilation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to CPH/JDC.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 146).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-01-29HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1434 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback